OH HB235 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-27 - Refer to Committee: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-27 - Refer to Committee: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3302.09 of the Revised Code regarding procedures for approval or disapproval of the state education plan for the federal Every Student Succeeds Act.
Title
Regards procedures under Every Student Succeeds Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-27 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Education |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-09-20 | House | Passed |
2017-06-21 | House | Reported: Education and Career Readiness |
2017-06-06 | House | Refer to Committee: Education and Career Readiness |
2017-05-23 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 02 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |