OH HB234 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 37-2)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 37-2)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 109.69, 109.731, 311.41, 311.42, 2923.11, 2923.124, 2923.125, 2923.126, 2923.128, 2923.1213, 2923.13, 2923.17, 2929.14, and 2941.144, to enact sections 311.43 and 1533.04, and to repeal sections 2923.1210 and 2923.22 of the Revised Code to revise the law governing firearms.
Title
To revise the law governing firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-10 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-30 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-12-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-12-10 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-09 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-09 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-04-07 | To Civil Justice | |
2014-04-07 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-04-02 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-03-12 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-07-17 | To Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2013-07-17 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 09 | 69 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 09 | 731 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
15 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 33 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 23 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 1210 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 1213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 124 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 126 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 128 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 22 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 29 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 41 | 144 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
3 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
3 | 11 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 11 | 42 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 11 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text |