OH HB229 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 49-29)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Effective 9/28/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5.261 of the Revised Code to designate February 3 as "Charles Follis Day."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Charles Follis Day

Sponsors

Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]
Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]
Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. Martin Sweeney [D]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]
Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]
Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. John Boccieri [D]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]
Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]Rep. Jonathan Dever [R]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]
Rep. Larry Householder [R]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]
Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. David Leland [D]
Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Rick Perales [R]
Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]
Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Ron Young [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Sen. Dave Burke [R]
Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]
Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]
Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]
Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]

Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28 Effective 9/28/18
2018-06-07HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2018-05-16SenatePassed - Amended
2018-05-16SenateInformally passed
2018-04-17SenateReported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2017-12-13SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2017-12-11SenateIntroduced
2017-12-05HousePassed
2017-06-21HouseReported: State and Local Government
2017-05-23HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2017-05-17HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback