OH HB222 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-03 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4506.09 and 5747.98 and to enact sections 122.91 and 5747.82 of the Revised Code to authorize a temporary income tax credit for an employer's expenses to train a commercial vehicle operator and increases the commercial driver's license skills test fee charged by the Department of Public Safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Credit tax-expenses in training commercial vehicle operator

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-03SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2020-02-24SenateIntroduced
2020-02-20HousePassed
2019-12-11HouseReported - Substitute: Ways and Means
2019-05-08HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2019-04-29HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1New CodeSee Bill Text
122New CodeSee Bill Text
12291New CodeSee Bill Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4506Amended CodeCitation Text
450609Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
574782New CodeSee Bill Text
574798Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback