OH HB214 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-05-14 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-05-14 - Effective Date
Summary
To amend sections 149.43, 2151.152, 2151.23, 2151.39, 3313.64, 5101.29, 5103.031, 5103.032, 5103.035, 5103.0312, 5103.0313, 5103.16, 5103.391, 5126.04, 5153.122, and 5153.123 and to enact sections 5103.23, 5103.231, 5103.232, 5103.233, 5103.234, 5103.235, 5103.236, and 5103.237 of the Revised Code relative to training for foster caregivers, the public record status of identifying information of current and prospective foster caregivers, petitioning Congress for expanded usage of Title IV-E funding, the Interstate Compact on the Placement of Children, and the coordination of the provision of services for foster children with mental retardation or developmental disabilities.
Title
Foster caregivers/foster children-mentally retarded/developmentally disabled-services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-05-14 | Effective Date | |
2008-02-13 | Governor Action | |
2008-02-23 | End of 10-day Period | |
2008-02-12 | Sent to Governor | |
2008-02-05 | Concurrence | |
2008-02-05 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2008-01-31 | Committee Report | |
2007-10-11 | To Health, Human Services, & Aging | |
2007-10-11 | Introduced to Senate | |
2007-10-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2007-06-26 | Committee Report | |
2007-05-08 | To Juvenile & Family Law | |
2007-05-08 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_214 |