OH HB191 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-5)
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-02 - To Judiciary Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Judiciary - Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-02 - To Judiciary Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Judiciary - Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2743.51, 2903.06, 2929.01, 2935.03, 4503.234, 4510.17, 4510.41, 4511.181, and 4511.251 and to enact section 4511.253 of the Revised Code to increase the penalties for street racing and to create the offense of "street racing manslaughter."
Title
To increase the penalties for street racing and to create the offense of "street racing manslaughter."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-02 | To Judiciary Criminal Justice | |
2009-12-02 | Introduced to Senate | |
2009-12-01 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2009-11-19 | Committee Report - S | |
2009-05-26 | To Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-26 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
27 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
27 | 43 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 03 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 29 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 35 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 03 | 234 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 10 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 11 | 181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 253 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=128_HB_191 |
Text | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/BillText128/128_HB_191_PH_Y.html |