OH HB190 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-12)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Refer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety
Pending: Senate Veterans and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 149.30 and 155.99 and to enact section 155.28 of the Revised Code to prohibit a war relic located on public property or cemetery association property from being sold, disturbed, or otherwise disposed of, except under certain circumstances, and to designate this act as the "Ohio Veterans' Heritage Protection Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enact Ohio Veterans' Heritage Protection Act re: war relics

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16SenateRefer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-06-10HousePassed
2021-05-06HouseReported: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs
2021-03-10HouseRefer to Committee: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs
2021-03-09HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
14930Amended CodeCitation Text
15528New CodeSee Bill Text
15599Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-190
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb190/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb190/RH/01/hb190_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb190/PH/02/hb190_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16114&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16343&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16567&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16590&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16987&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17069&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-190

Bill Comments

feedback