OH HB184 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To enact section 5.2267 of the Revised Code to designate March as "Multiple System Atrophy Awareness Month."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate March as "Multiple System Atrophy Awareness Month."

Sponsors

Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]
Sen. Troy Balderson [R]Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. William Batchelder [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]
Rep. Peter Beck [R]Rep. Terry Boose [R]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]
Sen. Edna Brown [D]Rep. Danny Bubp [R]Rep. Jim Buchy [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]
Sen. Capri Cafaro [D]Rep. John Carey [R]Rep. John Carney [D]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]
Rep. Ted Celeste [D]Sen. William Coley [R]Rep. Rex Damschroder [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]
Rep. Keith Faber [R]Rep. Lorraine Fende [D]Rep. Nancy Garland [D]Sen. Lou Gentile [D]
Rep. Ronald Gerberry [D]Rep. Jay Goyal [D]Rep. Cheryl Grossman [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Rep. Robert Hagan [D]Rep. David Hall [R]Rep. Bill Hayes [R]Sen. Brian Hill [R]
Sen. Cliff Hite [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]
Sen. Shannon Jones [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]Sen. Eric Kearney [D]Rep. Casey Kozlowski [R]
Rep. Al Landis [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Rep. Thomas Letson [D]
Rep. Clayton Luckie [D]Rep. Matt Lundy [D]Rep. Matthew Lynch [R]Rep. Dale Mallory [D]
Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Jarrod Martin [R]Rep. Robery Mecklenborg [R]Rep. Zack Milkovich [D]
Sen. Tom Niehaus [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Rep. Mark Okey [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]
Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Sen. Thomas Sawyer [D]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]
Rep. Barbara Sears [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]Rep. Marilyn Slaby [R]
Rep. Stephen Slesnick [D]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Sen. Shirley Smith [D]Rep. Michael Stinziano [D]
Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Sen. Nina Turner [D]Sen. Mark Wagoner [R]
Sen. Christopher Widener [R]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Rep. Roland Winburn [D]Rep. Ron Young [R]
Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2012-11-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-27 Effective Date
2012-12-20 Governor' Action
2012-12-27 End of 10-day period
2012-12-14 Sent to Governor
2012-11-28 Concurrence
2012-11-28 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-11-21 Committee Report
2012-05-09 To Health, Human Services, & Aging
2012-05-09 Introduced to Senate
2012-05-08 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-05-18 Committee Report
2011-03-31 To Health & Aging
2011-03-31 Introduced to House

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback