OH HB169 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-28 - Effective 12/23/21 - Certain sections effective March 24, 2022; one item vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4506.09 and 4506.13 and to enact section 4508.031 of the Revised Code to make appropriations to support recovery from the COVID-19 pandemic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide grants to bars, restaurants, and the lodging industry

Sponsors

Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]
Rep. Adam Bird [R]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]
Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]
Rep. Rodney Creech [R]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]
Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]
Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]
Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]
Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]
Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]
Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]
Rep. Phillip Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]
Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Monique Smith [D]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Brian Stewart [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]
Rep. Daniel Troy [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]
Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Bob Young [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]
Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]
Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]
Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]
Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]
Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-12-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-28 Effective 12/23/21 - Certain sections effective March 24, 2022; one item vetoed
2021-12-28HouseLine item veto receipt
2021-12-09HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2021-12-08SenatePassed - Amended
2021-12-08SenateReported - Substitute: Finance
2021-04-21SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2021-04-15HousePassed
2021-04-15HouseReported - Amended: Finance
2021-04-14HouseRe-referred: Finance
2021-03-24HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2021-03-03HouseRefer to Committee: Economic and Workforce Development
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
450609Amended CodeCitation Text
450613Amended CodeCitation Text
4508031New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-169
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb169/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb169/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb169/RCH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb169/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb169/PH/04?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb169/RS/05/hb169_05_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb169/PS/06/hb169_06_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb169/EN/07/hb169_07_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16030&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16180&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16188&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16187&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16294&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16300&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16342&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16383&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17991&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18007&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18006&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18027&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18048&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18045&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18072&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18129&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-169

Bill Comments

feedback