OH HB149 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-28 - Refer to Committee: Local Government and Elections
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-28 - Refer to Committee: Local Government and Elections
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3501.01, 3505.03, 3505.04, and 3513.257 of the Revised Code to require certain judicial candidates to appear on the ballot with a party designation.
Title
Require certain judicial candidates have party ballot designation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government and Elections |
2021-06-23 | House | Passed |
2021-06-10 | House | Reported: Government Oversight |
2021-02-24 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 01 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 05 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 05 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 13 | 257 | Amended Code | Citation Text |