OH HB13 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-15)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-28 - To Judiciary Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Judiciary - Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-28 - To Judiciary Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Judiciary - Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2907.06, 2950.13, and 2950.99 and to enact sections 2950.035 and 2950.044 of the Revised Code to prohibit Tier III sex offender/child victim offenders who have committed specified offenses against a victim under 16 years of age from knowingly being present on school premises or preschool or child day-care center premises and to increase the penalty for a first offense of sexual imposition to a misdemeanor of the first degree in specified circumstances.
Title
To prohibit Tier III sex offender/child victim offenders who have committed specified offenses against a victim under 16 years of age from knowingly being present on school premises or preschool or child day-care center premises and to increase the penalty for a first offense of sexual imposition to a misdemeanor of the first degree in specified circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | To Judiciary Criminal Justice | |
2010-05-28 | Introduced to Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2010-05-19 | Committee Report - S | |
2009-02-17 | To Criminal Justice | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 07 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 50 | 035 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 50 | 044 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 50 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 50 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=128_HB_13 |
Text | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/BillText128/128_HB_13_PH_Y.html |