NY S65062 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from November 30, 2009 until November 30, 2011, the expiration of the authorization to the county of Cattaraugus to impose additional 1% sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Extends from November 30, 2009 until November 30, 2011, the expiration of the authorization to the county of Cattaraugus to impose additional 1% sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-29 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
S366 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.97
A4233 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.97
S50432 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S64432 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
A4233 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.97
S50432 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S64432 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES