NY S09777 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - SIGNED CHAP.172
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - SIGNED CHAP.172
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the reporting deadline of the advisory panel on employee-owned enterprises from June 30, 2024 to June 30, 2025; extends for one year the advisory panel on employee-owned enterprises which is tasked with reporting and making recommendations on how best to support such businesses and promote the formation and growth of new employee-owned enterprises in New York state.
Title
Extends the reporting deadline of the advisory panel on employee-owned enterprises from June 30, 2024 to June 30, 2025; extends for one year the advisory panel on employee-owned enterprises which is tasked with reporting and making recommendations on how best to support such businesses and promote the formation and growth of new employee-owned enterprises in New York state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.172 |
2024-06-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.358 |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | substituted for a9969 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2024-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1680 |
2024-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A09969 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - substituted by s9777