NY S09749 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - SIGNED CHAP.171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - SIGNED CHAP.171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions related to the creation of a state information technology innovation center until June 30, 2028.
Title
Extends provisions related to the creation of a state information technology innovation center until June 30, 2028.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.171 |
2024-06-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.384 |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | substituted for a10409 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | referred to science and technology |
2024-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1619 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
A10409 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - substituted by s9749