NY A10409 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - substituted by s9749
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - substituted by s9749
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions related to the creation of a state information technology innovation center until June 30, 2028.
Title
Extends provisions related to the creation of a state information technology innovation center until June 30, 2028.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Science And Technology Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Science And Technology Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Assembly | substituted by s9749 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.384 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.384 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | referred to science and technology |
Same As/Similar To
S09749 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - SIGNED CHAP.171