NY S09713 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to expanding the list of individuals who may appear on behalf of taxpayers before the division of tax appeals.
Title
Relates to expanding the list of individuals who may appear on behalf of taxpayers before the division of tax appeals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10222 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1613 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10222 (Same As) 2024-09-27 - signed chap.366