NY S09525 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires pharmacies that are discontinuing to notify customers of such discontinuance and provide information including locations of other nearby pharmacies.
Title
Requires pharmacies that are discontinuing to notify customers of such discontinuance and provide information including locations of other nearby pharmacies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2024-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1792 |
2024-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9525B |
2024-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2024-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9525A |
2024-05-20 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2024-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09769 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - ordered to third reading rules cal.462