NY S09486 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.192
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.192
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to base proportions in assessing units in Nassau and Suffolk counties for 2024--2025.
Title
Relates to base proportions in assessing units in Nassau and Suffolk counties for 2024--2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.192 |
2024-07-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.293 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a10270 |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1224 |
2024-05-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10270 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - substituted by s9486