NY S09465 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - SIGNED CHAP.213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - SIGNED CHAP.213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the task force on social media and violent extremism; requires the domestic terrorism task force report relating to enacting the "Josef Neumann Hate Crimes Domestic Terrorism Act" to be delivered to the attorney general; increases penalties of certain violations for bias-related violence and intimidation; includes a person who subjects a person to harassment or summons police officer or peace officer without reason to suspect a violation of the penal law, any other criminal conduct, or an imminent threat to a person or property, or who aids or incites any of those activities.
Title
Establishes the task force on social media and violent extremism; requires the domestic terrorism task force report relating to enacting the "Josef Neumann Hate Crimes Domestic Terrorism Act" to be delivered to the attorney general; increases penalties of certain violations for bias-related violence and intimidation; includes a person who subjects a person to harassment or summons police officer or peace officer without reason to suspect a violation of the penal law, any other criminal conduct, or an imminent threat to a person or property, or who aids or incites any of those activities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.213 |
2022-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.666 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a10501 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1883 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A10501 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - substituted by s9465