NY S09432 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Binghamton to establish hotel and motel taxes of up to five percent.
Title
Authorizes the city of Binghamton to establish hotel and motel taxes of up to five percent.
Sponsors
Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10271 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1600 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10271 (Same As) 2024-09-27 - signed chap.367