NY S09425 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - SIGNED CHAP.410
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - SIGNED CHAP.410
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Kolel Rachmistrivka to file an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Title
Authorizes Kolel Rachmistrivka to file an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-27 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.410 |
2024-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.549 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a10434b |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 9425B |
2024-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 9425A |
2024-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1599 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10434 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - substituted by s9425b