NY S09419 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7628A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7628A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the reporting of certain accidents involving vehicles, including electric scooters and bicycles with electric assist; requires reports to include information indicating whether certain accidents involved electric scooters and bicycles with electric assist.
Title
Requires the reporting of certain accidents involving vehicles, including electric scooters and bicycles with electric assist; requires reports to include information indicating whether certain accidents involved electric scooters and bicycles with electric assist.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7628A |
2024-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1377 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07628 (Same As) 2024-07-11 - signed chap.196