NY S09392 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions relating to regulatory fines for small businesses to 2027.
Title
Extends certain provisions relating to regulatory fines for small businesses to 2027.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9966 |
2024-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1441 |
2024-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A09966 (Same As) 2024-08-28 - signed chap.252