NY S09381 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to employer violations of certain provisions allowing for workplace safety committees; allows the commissioner of labor to assess civil penalties and to seek additional relief for such violations.
Title
Relates to employer violations of certain provisions allowing for workplace safety committees; allows the commissioner of labor to assess civil penalties and to seek additional relief for such violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1611 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A10586 (Same As) 2022-07-06 - referred to labor