NY S09377 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the monetary jurisdictional limits of the New York city civil court from $25,000 to $50,000 in the corresponding statutes following the constitutional amendment in November 2021.
Title
Increases the monetary jurisdictional limits of the New York city civil court from $25,000 to $50,000 in the corresponding statutes following the constitutional amendment in November 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.552 |
2022-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.592 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a10461 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1791 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A10461 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - substituted by s9377