NY S09370 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9922A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9922A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to presumptive evidence for individuals who participated in the World Trade Center rescue, recovery and clean-up operations; provides that the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention World Trade Center Health Program Certification shall be deemed to be presumptive medical evidence of a causation of a qualifying condition.
Title
Relates to presumptive evidence for individuals who participated in the World Trade Center rescue, recovery and clean-up operations; provides that the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention World Trade Center Health Program Certification shall be deemed to be presumptive medical evidence of a causation of a qualifying condition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9922A |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1726 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A09922 (Same As) 2022-09-09 - signed chap.559