NY S09222 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the jockey health insurance reserve fund for the payment of premiums not yet paid; provides for the return of funds if such reserve fund becomes no longer necessary.
Title
Creates the jockey health insurance reserve fund for the payment of premiums not yet paid; provides for the return of funds if such reserve fund becomes no longer necessary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming And Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming And Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2024-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1129 |
2024-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |