NY S09145 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - SIGNED CHAP.401
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - SIGNED CHAP.401
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies procedures affecting the first annual election of fire district officials to a board of fire commissioners to allow voters to cast one vote for each open position on such board of fire commissioners to be filled in such election.
Title
Clarifies procedures affecting the first annual election of fire district officials to a board of fire commissioners to allow voters to cast one vote for each open position on such board of fire commissioners to be filled in such election.
Sponsors
Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-27 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.401 |
2024-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.467 |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | substituted for a10118 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2024-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1231 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10118 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - substituted by s9145