NY S09132 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10060
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10060
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the discontinuance of additional parkland and the granting of additional easements for improvements to the Metro-North railroad.
Title
Authorizes the discontinuance of additional parkland and the granting of additional easements for improvements to the Metro-North railroad.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10060 |
2024-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.974 |
2024-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
Same As/Similar To
A10060 (Same As) 2024-08-28 - signed chap.255