NY S09092 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10198A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10198A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain parcels of land from licensing restrictions prohibiting manufacturers, wholesalers and retailers of alcoholic beverages from sharing an interest in a licensed premises.
Title
Exempts certain parcels of land from licensing restrictions prohibiting manufacturers, wholesalers and retailers of alcoholic beverages from sharing an interest in a licensed premises.
Sponsors
Sen. Samra Brouk [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10198A |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1591 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9092A |
2022-05-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10198 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - signed chap.304