NY S09043 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-28 - SIGNED CHAP.280
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-28 - SIGNED CHAP.280
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Implements a residential parking system in the village of Port Chester.
Title
Implements a residential parking system in the village of Port Chester.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.280 |
2024-08-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | home rule request |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.543 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a9963a |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2024-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-04 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2024-06-04 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1720 |
2024-06-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9043A |
2024-05-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09963 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - substituted by s9043a