NY S09009 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9962
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9962
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the distribution of surcharges on off-track winnings for the period of September 1, 2022 until August 31, 2027; allows for the allocation of specific surcharge revenues to the same racetrack to continue for another five year period.
Title
Relates to the distribution of surcharges on off-track winnings for the period of September 1, 2022 until August 31, 2027; allows for the allocation of specific surcharge revenues to the same racetrack to continue for another five year period.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9962 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1582 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A09962 (Same As) 2022-08-17 - signed chap.526