NY A09962 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.526
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.526
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the distribution of surcharges on off-track winnings for the period of September 1, 2022 until August 31, 2027; allows for the allocation of specific surcharge revenues to the same racetrack to continue for another five year period.
Title
Relates to the distribution of surcharges on off-track winnings for the period of September 1, 2022 until August 31, 2027; allows for the allocation of specific surcharge revenues to the same racetrack to continue for another five year period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Assembly | signed chap.526 |
2022-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1582 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9009 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.252 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.252 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S09009 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9962