NY S08979 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7091
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7091
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electric vehicle charging stations and electric vehicle capable parking spaces to have handicap accessible spaces that are large enough to accommodate such wheelchair accessible electric vehicles, including but not limited to, vans and minivans.
Title
Requires electric vehicle charging stations and electric vehicle capable parking spaces to have handicap accessible spaces that are large enough to accommodate such wheelchair accessible electric vehicles, including but not limited to, vans and minivans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7091 |
2024-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.972 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07091 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY