NY S08976 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the delivery of telehealth services in schools by licensed providers.
Title
Authorizes the delivery of telehealth services in schools by licensed providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2024-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8976B |
2024-05-29 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8976A |
2024-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1285 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07602 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to higher education