NY S08967 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - PRINT NUMBER 8967A
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - PRINT NUMBER 8967A
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows direct descendants of a patient who has been deceased for a period of fifty years or longer to access such patient's clinical records.
Title
Allows direct descendants of a patient who has been deceased for a period of fifty years or longer to access such patient's clinical records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8967A |
2024-07-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1165 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A10125 (Same As) 2024-05-06 - referred to mental health