NY S08937 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits runaways and homeless youth under the age of 18 who are receiving approved crisis or support services to consent to medical, dental, health and hospital services.
Title
Permits runaways and homeless youth under the age of 18 who are receiving approved crisis or support services to consent to medical, dental, health and hospital services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.73 |
2022-12-23 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.780 |
2022-12-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.573 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a9604 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
2022-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1346 |
2022-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09604 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8937