NY S08931 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes indebtedness for the construction of sewage facilities contracted prior to 2034 in determining current local debt limitation.
Title
Excludes indebtedness for the construction of sewage facilities contracted prior to 2034 in determining current local debt limitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.726 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a9958 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2022-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1580 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-04-29 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2022-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A09958 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8931