NY A09958 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8931
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8931
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes indebtedness for the construction of sewage facilities contracted prior to 2034 in determining current local debt limitation.
Title
Excludes indebtedness for the construction of sewage facilities contracted prior to 2034 in determining current local debt limitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Judiciary (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Judiciary (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s8931 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.726 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to judiciary |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08931 (Same As) 2022-06-15 - DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE