NY S08929 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - SIGNED CHAP.119
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - SIGNED CHAP.119
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending workers' compensation coverage to certain TNC drivers including a TNC driver that is logged onto a TNC digital network and is not engaged in a TNC prearranged trip but is engaged in an activity reasonably related to driving as a TNC driver.
Title
Relates to extending workers' compensation coverage to certain TNC drivers including a TNC driver that is logged onto a TNC digital network and is not engaged in a TNC prearranged trip but is engaged in an activity reasonably related to driving as a TNC driver.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.119 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.77 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a10970 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2018-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1740 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10970 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - substituted by s8929