NY S08928 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10743A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10743A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Waives the residency requirements for the persons performing the functions of building inspector/code enforcement officer or assistant/deputy building inspector/code enforcement officer for Putnam Valley, Putnam County.
Title
Waives the residency requirements for the persons performing the functions of building inspector/code enforcement officer or assistant/deputy building inspector/code enforcement officer for Putnam Valley, Putnam County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10743A |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1895 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10743 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - signed chap.172