NY S08903 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a person with a disability who has their primary residence in a special needs trust, or a property owner who has a tenant with a disability whose lease provides them with a life interest in the property as long as the tenant remains in residence as eligible for a real property tax exemption pursuant to section 459-c of the real property tax law.
Title
Adds a person with a disability who has their primary residence in a special needs trust, or a property owner who has a tenant with a disability whose lease provides them with a life interest in the property as long as the tenant remains in residence as eligible for a real property tax exemption pursuant to section 459-c of the real property tax law.
Sponsors
Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. Mario Mattera [R] | Sen. Steven Rhoads [R] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Sen. William Weber [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-25 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.209 |
2024-07-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.509 |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a9948 |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2024-05-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.808 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09948 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - substituted by s8903