NY S08894 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9255B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9255B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Haverstraw to discontinue the use as parkland and alienate certain lands.
Title
Authorizes the village of Haverstraw to discontinue the use as parkland and alienate certain lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9255B |
2024-05-28 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1516 |
2024-05-28 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8894A |
2024-05-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-03-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09255 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY