NY S08890 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the date allowable for exemptions for first-time homebuyers of newly constructed homes to December 31, 2028.
Title
Extends the date allowable for exemptions for first-time homebuyers of newly constructed homes to December 31, 2028.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9135 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1381 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09135 (Same As) 2022-08-08 - signed chap.485