NY A09135 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-08 - signed chap.485
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-08 - signed chap.485
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the date allowable for exemptions for first-time homebuyers of newly constructed homes to December 31, 2028.
Title
Extends the date allowable for exemptions for first-time homebuyers of newly constructed homes to December 31, 2028.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-08 | Assembly | signed chap.485 |
2022-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1381 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8890 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.461 |
2022-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08890 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9135