NY S08841 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York state energy research and development authority to develop recommendations regarding the establishment of microgrids.
Title
Requires the New York state energy research and development authority to develop recommendations regarding the establishment of microgrids.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9123 |
2024-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1182 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09123 (Same As) 2024-05-28 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY