NY S08827 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any student graduating from a high school in New York state be provided with a voter registration form.
Title
Requires any student graduating from a high school in New York state be provided with a voter registration form.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2024-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1217 |
2024-05-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION |
2024-04-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8827A |
2024-04-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2024-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10309 (Same As) 2024-07-22 - enacting clause stricken