NY S08817 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11115A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the establishment of the "Cold Spring Harbor Volunteer and Exempt Firefighters' Benevolent Association".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the establishment of the "Cold Spring Harbor Volunteer and Exempt Firefighters' Benevolent Association".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A11115A
2018-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2126
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-14SenatePRINT NUMBER 8817A
2018-06-14SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-05-22SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A11115 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.260

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback