NY S08808 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10756A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10756A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the dormitory authority to construct and finance regional juvenile detention facilities.
Title
Authorizes the dormitory authority to construct and finance regional juvenile detention facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10756A |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2067 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8808A |
2018-06-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10756 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - signed chap.173