NY S08789 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the calculation of past service credit for members in the title of deputy sheriff transferring between the New York state and local employees' retirement system to the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.
Title
Relates to the calculation of past service credit for members in the title of deputy sheriff transferring between the New York state and local employees' retirement system to the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1399 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10726 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - reported referred to ways and means